Vilmenay v. British Airways PLC, Company
Plaintiff: Joel Vilmenay
Defendant: British Airways PLC, Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12155
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing fee paid from British Airways PLC, Company for Darrell Cherry re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $ 100) (aj)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 3/2/2020. Issued by the Clerk on 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pre-Trial Notice)(mm) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marissa Nicole Lefland. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 9/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Marissa Nicole Lefland (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) by British Airways PLC, Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Marissa N LeFland, #2 Exhibit Notice of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Cherry, Darrell) Modified text on 9/23/2019 (mm).
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: Preliminary Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(am)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter International Consolidated Airlines Group as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by British Airways PLC, Company identifying corporate parent International Consolidated Airlines Group for British Airways PLC, Company.(Cherry, Darrell) Modified text/added corporate parent on 9/10/2019 (mm).
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by British Airways PLC, Company. Attorney Darrell K. Cherry added to party British Airways PLC, Company(pty:dft).(Cherry, Darrell)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Osmery S Batrez of Complaint served on British Airways, PLC, Company on August 16, 2019; answer due 9/6/2019 filed by Joel Vilmenay. (Meyer, Daniel) Modified text/updated answer due date on 8/23/2019 (mm).
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to British Airways PLC, Company. (mm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7805435) filed by Joel Vilmenay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Daniel A. Meyer added to party Joel Vilmenay (pty:pla).(Meyer, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vilmenay v. British Airways PLC, Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Vilmenay
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Airways PLC, Company
Represented By: Marissa Nicole Lefland
Represented By: Darrell K. Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?