Aucoin v. James River Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: virginia aucoin
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Portier, LLC, James River Insurance Company, Theodore Kemp, Uber Technologies, Inc., Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company and Progressive Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12174
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing as moot #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Virginia Aucoin. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/2/2019.(jls)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING #11 Motion for Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/2/2019.(jls)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss by Virginia Aucoin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richardson, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that the telephone scheduling conference is hereby CANCELED to be reset, if necessary, following the Court's ruling on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/12/2019.(jls)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Virginia Aucoin. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Richardson, Timothy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Security Insurance Company.Attorney Jason Paul Foote added to party Progressive Security Insurance Company(pty:selreq).(Foote, Jason)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Remand to State Court by Virginia Aucoin. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Richardson, Timothy) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jls).
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference utilizing the number listed in the notice. By Clerk. (kac)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Answer to Complaint. (1) Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 4 to document 1. (2) Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section B and Magistrate (3). (clw)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by James River Insurance Company.(Forte, Darrin) Modified text/linkage on 8/27/2019 (clw).
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Theodore Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Musgrave, Richard) Modified text/link on 8/19/2019 (pp).
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-7165 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7809219) filed by Theodore Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Verification, #8 Consent to Removal, #9 Consent to Removal, #10 Consent to Removal)Attorney Richard Todd Musgrave added to party Theodore Kemp(pty:selreq).(Musgrave, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aucoin v. James River Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: virginia aucoin
Represented By: Timothy R. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portier, LLC
Represented By: Jared A. Davidson
Represented By: Paula Marcello Wellons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Darrin L. Forte
Represented By: Colin C. Cisco
Represented By: Lyon H. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Kemp
Represented By: Richard Todd Musgrave
Represented By: Amanda Huling Aucoin
Represented By: Samuel Craig Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jared A. Davidson
Represented By: Paula Marcello Wellons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Company
Represented By: James D. Caboni-Quinn
Represented By: Jason Paul Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?