Houma Firefighters Local 1405 et al v. Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government
Plaintiff: Matthew Landry, Randall Swalley, Jr., Michael Deroche, Jr., Albert Swan, Heath Davis, Dave Domangue, Jimmy Guillot, Diedrick Austin, Jake Allemand, Jack Plessala, Mark Stevenson, Corey Duplantis, Ramon Doucette, Michael Millet, Matthew Spradlin, Jacob Aucoin, Raymond McGuire, Jordan Collins, Chris LeCompte, Jr., Ross Malagarie, Stephen Hebert, Bruce Short, John Hickman, Jr., Keith Ward, Brad Pennison, Eddie Berthelot, Jr., Ernest Mott, Sean Fonseca, Brent Chassion, Jacyln Clement, Hayward Sims, Jr and Houma Firefighters Local 1405
Defendant: Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government
Not Yet Classified: Shan Fonseca, Jaclyn Clement, Brent Chaisson, Houma Firefighers Local 1405 and Hayward Sims, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12190
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/2/19. (ko)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Considering the foregoing Joint Motion to Continue Date of Submission on Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. 7) filed by Defendants, Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand currently scheduled for submission on the briefs on September 25, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby rescheduled for submission on November 6, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/9/2019.(cg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue by Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marceaux, Brian)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue by Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marceaux, Brian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/29/2019) (cg). Modified on 8/29/2019 (cg).
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jake Allemand, Jacob Aucoin, Diedrick Austin, Eddie Berthelot, Jr, Brent Chassion, Jacyln Clement, Jordan Collins, Heath Davis, Michael Deroche, Jr, Dave Domangue, Ramon Doucette, Corey Duplantis, Sean Fonseca, Jimmy Guillot, Stephen Hebert, John Hickman, Jr, Houma Firefighters Local 1405, Matthew Landry, Chris Lecompte, Jr, Ross Malagarie, Raymond McGuire, Michael Millet, Ernest Mott, Brad Pennison, Jack Plessala, Bruce Short, Hayward Sims, Jr, Matthew Spradlin, Mark Stevenson, Randall Swalley, Jr, Albert Swan, Keith Ward. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Arcuri, Blake)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Response/Reply to #3 Directives by Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Marceaux, Brian) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/28/2019) (cg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/28/2019) (cg). Modified text and link on 8/28/2019 (cg).
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government (pp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
August 16, 2019 Filing fee received from Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government:Receipt 053L-7809579 $ 400 (cc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd Judicial District Court, case number 186377 (Fee previously paid) filed by Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit)Attorney Brian John Marceaux added to party Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government(pty:selreq).(Marceaux, Brian) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/16/2019) (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houma Firefighters Local 1405 et al v. Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Landry
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Swalley, Jr.
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Deroche, Jr.
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Swan
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heath Davis
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Domangue
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Guillot
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diedrick Austin
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Allemand
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Plessala
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Stevenson
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Duplantis
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Doucette
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Millet
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Spradlin
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Aucoin
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond McGuire
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Collins
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris LeCompte, Jr.
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Malagarie
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hebert
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Short
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hickman, Jr.
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Ward
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Pennison
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Berthelot, Jr.
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Mott
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Fonseca
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Chassion
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacyln Clement
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayward Sims, Jr
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houma Firefighters Local 1405
Represented By: Laura C Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Shan Fonseca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Jaclyn Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Brent Chaisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Houma Firefighers Local 1405
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Hayward Sims, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government
Represented By: Brian John Marceaux
Represented By: Michelle L. Neil
Represented By: Julius P. Hebert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?