Aptim Environmental & Infrastructure, LLC et al v. Allco, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jonathon Hunt and Aptim Environmental & Infrastructure, LLC
Defendant: Allco, LLC and Allco Virgin Islands, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12215
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Aptim Environmental & Infrastructure, LLC, Jonathon Hunt. (Kurtz, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) or Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Colorado River Abstention.**Exhibits on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (am)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Expedite consideration of its Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Louisiana State Court Proceedings. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) or Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Colorado River Abstention by Allco Virgin Islands, LLC, Allco, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition, #4 Exhibit 2 - July 19, 2019 Discovery Requests, #5 Exhibit 3 - Exception of Prematurity)Attorney Kerry James Miller added to party Allco Virgin Islands, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kerry James Miller added to party Allco, LLC(pty:dft).(Miller, Kerry) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/21/2019) (am). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/21/2019) (am). (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/21/2019) (am). Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Allco Virgin Islands, LLC, Allco, LLC re #4 MOTION to Expedite (Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay of Louisiana State Court Proceedings)(R.Doc. 3) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Aptim & J Hunt Objection to Allco's First Set of Discovery Requests)(Miller, Kerry)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple fillable boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Allco Virgin Islands, LLC, Allco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite (Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay of Louisiana State Court Proceedings)(R.Doc. 3) by Aptim Environmental & Infrastructure, LLC, Jonathon Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and, MOTION to Stay Louisiana State Court Proceedings by Aptim Environmental & Infrastructure, LLC, Jonathon Hunt. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Notice of Submission)(Kurtz, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allco Virgin Islands, LLC, Allco, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7811773) filed by Aptim Environmental & Infrastructure, LLC, Jonathon Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Allco, LLC, #4 Summons to Allco Virgin Islands, LLC)Attorney Michael David Kurtz added to party Aptim Environmental & Infrastructure, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Kurtz added to party Jonathon Hunt(pty:pla).(Kurtz, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/19/2019) (am). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/19/2019) (am). Modified text on 8/19/2019 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aptim Environmental & Infrastructure, LLC et al v. Allco, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allco, LLC
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Paul C. Thibodeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allco Virgin Islands, LLC
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Paul C. Thibodeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Hunt
Represented By: Michael David Kurtz
Represented By: Kristen Lewis Hayes
Represented By: Gregory E. Bodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aptim Environmental & Infrastructure, LLC
Represented By: Michael David Kurtz
Represented By: Kristen Lewis Hayes
Represented By: Gregory E. Bodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?