Steel Service Oilfield Tubular, Inc v. Rovig Minerals, Inc
Plaintiff: Steel Service Oilfield Tubular, Inc
Defendant: Rovig Minerals, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv12236
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 02:30 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(gec)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rovig Minerals, Inc.(Hughes, Daniel)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint as to Rovig Minerals, Inc answer due 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/16/19. (ko)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Rovig Minerals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Order)Attorney Daniel Clarence Hughes added to party Rovig Minerals, Inc(pty:dft).(Hughes, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Rovig Minerals, Inc served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Lee, Joseph)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Rovig Minerals, Inc. (clw)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. This is a duplicate filing of document 2 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary. (clw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Rovig Minerals, Inc (Fee previously paid) filed by Steel Service Oilfield Tubular, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Joseph)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 DUPLICATE: See Doc 2. COMPLAINT with jury demand against Rovig Minerals, Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7815446) filed by Steel Service Oilfield Tubular, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Attorney Joseph E. Lee, III added to party Steel Service Oilfield Tubular, Inc(pty:pla).(Lee, Joseph) Modified on 8/21/2019 (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steel Service Oilfield Tubular, Inc v. Rovig Minerals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rovig Minerals, Inc
Represented By: Daniel Clarence Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steel Service Oilfield Tubular, Inc
Represented By: Joseph E. Lee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?