Hex Stone Incorporated v JRC Marine, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Hex Stone Incorporated
Defendant: Larry P Fitch, JRC Marine, LLC and Ranny Fitch
Case Number: 2:2019cv12264
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00024. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (sa)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motions to transfer case to the Eastern District of Louisiana #15 and #22 are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendants Ranny Fitch and JRC for extension of time #16 is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall delay transfer of this case to the Eastern District of Louisiana for fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 8/7/19. (KEK) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 34 SURREPLY to Motion re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana filed by Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 33 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Larry P Fitch, Ranny Fitch, JRC Marine, LLC, Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated. (KEK) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen: Telephone Conference held on 7/9/2019. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file a sur-reply #30 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 07/09/2019. (LXC) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit C (Affidavit) & Exhibit C-1)(Mondl, James) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana, #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana filed by Defendant Larry P Fitch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Larry Fitch)(Lucas, Theodore) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Larry P. Fitch for extension of time until July 5, 2019, to file reply memorandum #27 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 07/01/2019. (LXC) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, up to and including July 5, 2019 by Defendant Larry P Fitch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Lucas, Theodore) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana filed by Defendants Ranny Fitch, JRC Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sohn, Daryl) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana, #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana filed by Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Affidavit, #2 Ex. B - Survey)(Mondl, James) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/11/2019) (NEP). [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' consent motion for extension of time until June 20, 2019, to respond to defendants' motions to transfer #23 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 06/06/2019. (LXC) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana by Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated. (Mondl, James) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana by Defendant Larry P Fitch. (Lucas, Theodore) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Theodore H. Lucas for Defendant Larry P Fitch. (Lucas, Theodore) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond (ECF No. 19) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including June 6, 2019, to respond to the pending motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 6/5/2019. (NDT) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana by Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated. (McNelley, Richard) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
May 20, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana filed by Defendants Ranny Fitch, JRC Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sohn, Daryl) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Defendants Ranny Fitch, JRC Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Sohn, Daryl) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Ranny Fitch, JRC Marine, LLC. (Sohn, Daryl) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana by Defendants Ranny Fitch, JRC Marine, LLC. (Sohn, Daryl) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Ranny Fitch, JRC Marine, LLC.. (Sohn, Daryl) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Daryl F. Sohn for Defendants Ranny Fitch, JRC Marine, LLC. (Sohn, Daryl) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant JRC Marine, LLC. The summons was emailed to Richard D. McNelley. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM Request for Alias Summons by Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons Alias Summons for JRC Marine, LLC)(McNelley, Richard) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Hex Stone Incorporated as to JRC Marine, LLC. (McNelley, Richard) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Hex Stone Incorporated. Ranny Fitch served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (McNelley, Richard) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Hex Stone Incorporated. Larry P Fitch served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (McNelley, Richard) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Larry P Fitch, Ranny Fitch, JRC Marine, LLC. The summons was emailed to to attorney Rich McNelley. (KEK) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated Process Server: Dixon Process Service (McNelley, Richard) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated Process Server: Triple Oak Investigation Services, LLC (McNelley, Richard) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM Request for Summonses to Issue by Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(McNelley, Richard) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/12/2019) (KEK). (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/12/2019) (KEK). [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard D. McNelley for Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated. (McNelley, Richard) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 3. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) - Due to electronic case opening, the above numbered case was inadvertently opened in error. Therefore, this case will be administratively closed. The new case number in the Northern Division is 2:19cv24 JMB. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Hex Stone Incorporated. Parent companies: Wayne B. Smith, Inc., Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Mondl, James) [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-7101902, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Hex Stone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mondl, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Request to Waive Service, #6 Waiver of Service) (BAK). [Transferred from moed on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hex Stone Incorporated v JRC Marine, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry P Fitch
Represented By: Theodore H. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRC Marine, LLC
Represented By: Daryl G. Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranny Fitch
Represented By: Daryl G. Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hex Stone Incorporated
Represented By: Richard D. McNelley
Represented By: James K. Mondl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?