Hebert v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Mr. David Hebert and David Hebert
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits, L.L.C. and UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12267
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits, L.L.C. on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Pellegrin, David)
August 31, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Pellegrin, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(clw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (clw)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7819984) filed by David Hebert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney David C. Pellegrin added to party David Hebert(pty:pla).(Pellegrin, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/23/2019) (clw). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/23/2019) (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hebert v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Specialty Benefits, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. David Hebert
Represented By: David C. Pellegrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hebert
Represented By: David C. Pellegrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?