Bauer v. Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ernest J. Bauer and Ernest J. Bauer, Jr.
Defendant: Metropolitan Property & Casualty Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company and MetLife Auto
Case Number: 2:2019cv12299
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 09:30 AM before case manager, by telephone. (cbs)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Attorney Matthew J. Ungarino added to party Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Ungarino, Matthew) Modified text/link on 8/30/2019 (sa).
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (go)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Property & Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Property & Casualty Company (Bordelon, David) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (clw).
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance by Metropolitan Property & Casualty Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Bordelon, David) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (clw).
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court-St. Tammany, case number 2019-13785 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7825988) filed by Metropolitan Property & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)Attorney David Ira Bordelon added to party Metropolitan Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Bordelon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer v. Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest J. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest J. Bauer, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy F. Upton
Represented By: Robert C. Martell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property & Casualty Company
Represented By: David Ira Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David Ira Bordelon
Represented By: Matthew J. Ungarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Auto
Represented By: David Ira Bordelon
Represented By: Matthew J. Ungarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?