Mallory v. Perimeter Healthcare, LLC
Plaintiff: Sandra Mallory
Defendant: Perimeter Healthcare, LLC and REP Perimeter Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12412
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019 03:00 PM before case manager by telephone. Issued by clerk.(ecm)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Perimeter Healthcare, LLC, REP Perimeter Holdings, LLC.Attorney John William Hite, III added to party Perimeter Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft).(Hite, John)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to REP Perimeter Holdings, LLC answer due 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/3/2019. (ecm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by REP Perimeter Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney John William Hite, III added to party Perimeter Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft).(Hite, John) Modified text/filers on 10/3/2019 (am).
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Perimeter Healthcare, LLC served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Bizer, Andrew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Perimeter Healthcare, LLC. (am)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Perimeter Healthcare, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7836282) filed by Sandra Mallory. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Andrew David Bizer added to party Sandra Mallory(pty:pla).(Bizer, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallory v. Perimeter Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Mallory
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Emily A. Westermeier
Represented By: Garret S DeReus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perimeter Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: John William Hite, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REP Perimeter Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James G. Albertine, III
Represented By: John William Hite, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?