Gelini v. Lyft, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Gelini, Joseph and Steadfast Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12466
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Steadfast Insurance Company.(Bowyer, Nicole)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, answer as to Steadfast Insurance Company due 09/25/2019. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/13/19. (ko)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email to Plaintiff's Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Bowyer, Nicole)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Gelini, Joseph v. Steadfast, case number 2019-4246 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7842048) filed by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal Notice of Filing of Documents, #3 State Court Pleadings State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Email from Plaintiff's Counsel, #5 Exhibit Dismissal of Lyft, Inc, #6 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing)Attorney Nicole Tamilyn Bowyer added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:selreq).(Bowyer, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gelini v. Lyft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Gelini, Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicole Tamilyn Bowyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?