Redditt v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cynthia Redditt
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12494
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Jury Trial (2 days) set for 7/20/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. All discovery must be completed by 6/9/2020.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jjs)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Answer to Notice of Removal. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section R Judge Sarah S. Vance.** (mm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company.(Donovan, James)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 11:15 AM before case manager by telephone.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/1/19.(jjs)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECUSAL ORDER: Judge Jane Triche Milazzo recused. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah S. Vance. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 09/10/2019.(am)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company by Allstate Insurance Company (Donovan, James) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (am).
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Donovan, James)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 796-770 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7845374) filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Attorney James L. Donovan, Jr added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Donovan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redditt v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Redditt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: James L. Donovan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?