Gilmore v. Gretna Village Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Wayne Gilmore
Defendant: Gretna Village Investments, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12555
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Gretna Village Investments, LLC is granted an additional twenty-one (21) days within which to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/30/19. (ecm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. **Caption contains incorrect case number. On future filings please correct caption to reflect case 19-12555.** (am)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Gretna Village Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DiRosa, Joseph)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Gretna Village Investments, LLC is granted an additional twenty-one (21) days within which to file responsive pleadings herein. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/3/2019. (ecm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint.**Caption contains incorrect case number. On future filings please correct caption to reflect case 19-12555.** (am)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Gretna Village Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Joseph Vincent DiRosa, Jr added to party Gretna Village Investments, LLC(pty:dft).(DiRosa, Joseph)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Gretna Village Investments, LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Sims, Georgianne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gretna Village Investments, LLC. (am)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gretna Village Investments, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7850595) filed by Wayne Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Georgianne Sims added to party Wayne Gilmore(pty:pla).(Sims, Georgianne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Gretna Village Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Gilmore
Represented By: Georgianne Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretna Village Investments, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Vincent DiRosa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?