Crescent City Surgical Centre v. UnitedHealthcare of Louisiana, Inc.
Plaintiff: Crescent City Surgical Centre
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Louisiana, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12586
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon: Motion Hearing held on 11/7/2019 re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Crescent City Surgical Centre. (Court Reporter Mary Thompson.) (sbs)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE: Because R. Doc. #13 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(sbs)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Crescent City Surgical Centre re #5 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(sbs)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 11/4/2019. (sbs)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #5 Motion to Remand by Crescent City Surgical Centre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Flanagan, Thomas) Modified text on 11/1/2019 (sbs).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 10/30/2019. (sbs)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal by UnitedHealthcare of Louisiana, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Manual Attachment, #2 Proposed Order)(Schoen, Hunter) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (sbs).
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by UnitedHealthcare of Louisiana, Inc. re #5 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C Under Seal, #4 Exhibit D Under Seal)(Schoen, Hunter) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (sbs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/30/2019) (sbs). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/30/2019) (sbs). (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/30/2019) (sbs).
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT - Oral Argument re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Crescent City Surgical Centre will be heard before the Honorable Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on November 7, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (sbs)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Crescent City Surgical Centre regarding #5 MOTION to Remand. (Flanagan, Thomas) Modified text on 10/3/2019 (sbs).
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Crescent City Surgical Centre. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)(Flanagan, Thomas) Modified text on 10/3/2019 (sbs).
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by UnitedHealthcare of Louisiana, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schoen, Hunter) Modified text on 9/27/2019 (sbs).
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by UnitedHealthcare of Louisiana, Inc. By the Clerk.(sbs)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC, Jefferson Parish, case number 793-775 "O" (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7853992) filed by UnitedHealthcare of Louisiana, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit) Attorney Hunter Jacob Schoen added to party UnitedHealthcare of Louisiana, Inc.(pty:dft).(Schoen, Hunter) Modified text on 9/16/2019 (sbs). (Attachments 1, 8 and 9 replaced on 9/16/2019) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crescent City Surgical Centre v. UnitedHealthcare of Louisiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crescent City Surgical Centre
Represented By: Thomas J. Capella
Represented By: Gilbert V. Andry, IV
Represented By: Barbara G. Baier
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Louisiana, Inc.
Represented By: William Bernard Gaudet
Represented By: Sara C. Valentine
Represented By: Hunter Jacob Schoen
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?