Bedi v. Price
Plaintiff: Bryan Bedi
Defendant: Melinda Price
Case Number: 2:2019cv12590
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING as to Melinda Price - IT IS ORDERED that on or before Friday, November 22, 2019, plaintiff Melinda Price shall file a response containing a written statement of her position concerning this Court's Rule to Show Cause Order and a list of citations of authorities on which plaintiff relies to establish subject-matter jurisdiction over her complaint. The failure to respond in writing as directed will result in the dismissal of the captioned complaint for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that there will be NO ORAL HEARING, and the matter will be deemed under advisement on the briefs on Friday, November 22, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 10/28/2019.(cg)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas for a Report and Recommendation regarding whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 9/18/2019.(jeg)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 9/18/2019. (cg)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melinda Price. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedi v. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Bedi
Represented By: Laura Jean Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?