Loomis Armored US, LLC v. ATM Worldwide, LLC
Plaintiff: Loomis Armored US, LLC
Defendant: ATM Worldwide llc and ATM Worldwide, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12595
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Waiver of Service Executed. **1. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Waiver of the Service of Summons. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. 2. Filing attorney entered incorrect date for the date waiver sent to party; waiver sent to ATM Worldwide, LLC on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to ATM Worldwide, LLC on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Carriere, Paul) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/31/2019) (mm). Modified waiver/answer due date on 10/31/2019 (mm).
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Complaint. **Document filed in error. Document should have been filed as the main document in record document 1. Clerk has attached complaint to record document 1. In addition, a corrected complaint with the attorney's signature was subsequently provided to the clerk. Clerk attached corrected complaint to record document 1. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **1. Complaint filed at record document 2 has been correctly attached to this filing as the main document. Civil cover should not have been filed as the main document. 2. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet and the waiver of service. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 **FILED IN ERROR - ATTACHED TO REC. DOC. 1** COMPLAINT against ATM Worldwide, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7856071) filed by Loomis Armored US, LLC.(Trinchard, James) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/17/2019) (mm). Modified text on 9/17/2019 (mm).
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATM Worldwide, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7855271) filed by Loomis Armored US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) Attorney James L. Trinchard added to party Loomis Armored US, LLC(pty:pla).(Trinchard, James) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/17/2019) (mm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mm). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/17/2019) (mm). Modified text on 9/17/2019 (mm). (WAIVER OF SERVICE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loomis Armored US, LLC v. ATM Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loomis Armored US, LLC
Represented By: James L. Trinchard
Represented By: Clare Willis Trinchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATM Worldwide llc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATM Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?