Rivera et al v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Theresa Rivera and Christopher Rivera
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12616
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 12/17/2019 03:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 7/28/2020. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(dno)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Walmart, Inc. (Beard, Roy)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (dno)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Walmart, Inc..(Beard, Roy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Walmart, Inc. re #3 Order. (Beard, Roy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart, Inc. (pp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from CIVIL DISTRICT COURT, PARISH OF ORLEANS, case number 2019-8022 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7856311) filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - CT Corporation Service of Process, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Roy C. Beard added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft).(Beard, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera et al v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Rivera
Represented By: Warren A. Forstall, Jr.
Represented By: William E. Mura, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Rivera
Represented By: Warren A. Forstall, Jr.
Represented By: William E. Mura, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Roy C. Beard
Represented By: Quincy T. Crochet
Represented By: Peter Sinnott Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?