Hopkins v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Hopkins
Defendant: Elton Tramble, James Spencer, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Newman Transport, LLC and Jamar Spencer
Case Number: 2:2019cv12618
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Newman Transport, LLC, Elton Tramble.Attorney Kimberly G. Anderson added to party Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly G. Anderson added to party Newman Transport, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly G. Anderson added to party Elton Tramble(pty:dft).(Anderson, Kimberly)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Safe Auto Insurance Company.Attorney P. M. Donovan added to party Safe Auto Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Donovan, P.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Safe Auto Insurance Company served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Hingle, Waldon)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Hingle, Waldon)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Newman Transport, LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Hingle, Waldon)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Elton Tramble served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Hingle, Waldon)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Newman Transport, LLC, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Jamar Spencer, Elton Tramble. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(am)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7856419) filed by Lawrence Hopkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Attorney Waldon Michael Hingle, III added to party Lawrence Hopkins(pty:pla).(Hingle, Waldon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Hopkins
Represented By: Waldon Michael Hingle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elton Tramble
Represented By: Kimberly G. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: P. M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly G. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newman Transport, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly G. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamar Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?