Darby v. Snow et al
Plaintiff: Judith M Darby
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company, David G. Snow, Albert J. Decorte, ABC Insurance Company, Sadie A. Gentry and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2019cv12622
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 46:0971pi
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Sadie A. Gentry. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Philip A. Costa added to party Sadie A. Gentry(pty:dft).(Costa, Philip)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to David G. Snow. (Bezou, Jacques) (Main Document 12 replaced on 10/22/2019) (cg).
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Sadie A. Gentry. (Bezou, Jacques) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/22/2019) (cg).
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; USAA General Indemnity Company served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Bezou, Jacques) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/11/2019) (cg). Modified on 10/11/2019 (cg).
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Albert J. Decorte served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Bezou, Jacques) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/11/2019) (cg). Modified on 10/11/2019 (cg).
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Albert J. Decorte served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Bezou, Jacques) Modified on 10/11/2019 (cg).
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; USAA General Indemnity Company served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Bezou, Jacques) Modified on 10/11/2019 (cg).
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sadie A. Gentry. (cg)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Sadie A. Gentry filed by Judith M Darby re #1 Complaint,. (Bezou, Jacques)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Albert J. Decorte, Sadie A. Gentry, David G. Snow, USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(cg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Bezou, Jacques)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7856600) filed by Judith M Darby. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jacques F. Bezou, Jr added to party Judith M Darby(pty:pla).(Bezou, Jacques)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darby v. Snow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert J. Decorte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadie A. Gentry
Represented By: Philip A. Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith M Darby
Represented By: Jacques F. Bezou, Jr.
Represented By: Erica A. Hyla
Represented By: Jacques Francois Bezou
Represented By: Robert A. Barnett
Represented By: Matthew L. Devereaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?