Miraglia v. Cafe Maspero Decatur, LLC
Plaintiff: Mitchell Miraglia
Defendant: Cafe Maspero Decatur, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12657
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Cafe Maspero Decatur, LLC.(Tafaro, Lauren)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Cafe Maspero Decatur, LLC answer due 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/24/19. (ko)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 10/23/2019.(ajn)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Cafe Maspero Decatur, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Lauren Lopresto Tafaro added to party Cafe Maspero Decatur, LLC(pty:dft).(Tafaro, Lauren)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Cafe Maspero Decatur, LLC served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Bizer, Andrew)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cafe Maspero Decatur, LLC. (sbs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cafe Maspero Decatur, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7859422) filed by Mitchell Miraglia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Andrew David Bizer added to party Mitchell Miraglia(pty:pla).(Bizer, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miraglia v. Cafe Maspero Decatur, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Miraglia
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cafe Maspero Decatur, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?