Aristoteles Marine, LLC v. Stena Image M/V
Plaintiff: Aristoteles Marine, LLC
Defendant: Stena Image M/V
Case Number: 2:2019cv12683
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00287. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (my)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. This matter is transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana, New Orleans Division. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 8/27/19. (mrp, ) [Transferred from txed on 9/19/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Aristoteles Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(James, David) [Transferred from txed on 9/19/2019.]
July 1, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, ) [Transferred from txed on 9/19/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, ) [Transferred from txed on 9/19/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Aristoteles Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order, #3 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest)(James, David) [Transferred from txed on 9/19/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against m/v STENA IMAGE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7328657.), filed by Aristoteles Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(James, David) [Transferred from txed on 9/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aristoteles Marine, LLC v. Stena Image M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aristoteles Marine, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Freeman
Represented By: Marianne E Laine
Represented By: David Earl James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stena Image M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?