Associated Terminals, LLC 401K Plan v. Mack, et al.
Plaintiff: Associated Terminals, LLC 401K Plan
Defendant: Gloria Mack, Wendell Mack, Nodora Henry, Victoria Mack, Leroy Mack, Jr., Vondrice Lafrance, Algin Mack and Yolanda Edwards
Case Number: 2:2019cv12697
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Wendell Mack served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Vitenas, Christopher)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Victoria Mack served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Vitenas, Christopher)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Yolanda Edwards served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Vitenas, Christopher)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Algin Mack served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Vitenas, Christopher)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Yolanda Edwards, Vondrice Lafrance, Algin Mack, Gloria Mack, Leroy Mack, Jr, Victoria Mack, Wendell Mack. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(jeg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Vitenas, Christopher) (Main Document 3 and Attachments 1-6 replaced on 9/25/2019) (jeg). Modified text on 9/25/2019 (jeg).
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yolanda Edwards, Nodora Henry, Vondrice Lafrance, Algin Mack, Leroy Mack, Victoria Mack, Wendell Mack, Gloria Mack (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7865338) filed by Associated Terminals, LLC 401K Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher Michael Vitenas added to party Associated Terminals, LLC 401K Plan(pty:intplp).(Vitenas, Christopher) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Associated Terminals, LLC 401K Plan v. Mack, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nodora Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Mack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vondrice Lafrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Algin Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Terminals, LLC 401K Plan
Represented By: Christopher G. Morris
Represented By: Christopher Michael Vitenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?