Samuel v. RemoteMD Medical Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Samuel
Defendant: RemoteMD Medical Services LLC and Offshore Service Vessels, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12913
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
2 Judge: Michael North
3 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/18/2019.(jeg)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Lance M Africk, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on October 3, 2019.(mp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Offshore Service Vessels, LLC, RemoteMD Medical Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7884422) filed by Richard Scott Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 3.1 Certificate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons RemoteMD Medical Services Summons, #4 Summons Offshore Service Vessels Summons)Attorney Michael Letourneau added to party Richard Scott Samuel(pty:pla).(Letourneau, Michael) Modified text on 10/3/2019 (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuel v. RemoteMD Medical Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Samuel
Represented By: Michael Letourneau
Represented By: Justin McCarthy Chopin
Represented By: Richard A Chopin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RemoteMD Medical Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Service Vessels, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?