BlueTarp Financial, Inc. v. Robertson Development, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BlueTarp Financial, Inc.
Defendant: Lawrence Q. Robertson, Robertson Development, LLC and Lawrence Robertson
Case Number: 2:2019cv13006
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(sbs)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lawrence Robertson, Robertson Development, LLC.(sbs)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Robertson Development, LLC served on 10/13/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Hart, Joseph)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BlueTarp Financial, Inc. served on 10/13/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Hart, Joseph)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lawrence Robertson, Robertson Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sbs)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Lawrence Robertson, Robertson Development, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7892827) filed by BlueTarp Financial, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) Attorney Joseph Henry Hart, IV added to party BlueTarp Financial, Inc.(pty:pla).(Hart, Joseph) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BlueTarp Financial, Inc. v. Robertson Development, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Q. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertson Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BlueTarp Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?