Kuhn v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kuhn
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13120
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Chaney, Mark) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (clw).
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Chaney, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record for Attorneys Eric J. Simonson and Mark James Chaney, III for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/18/2019. (sbs)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chaney, Mark)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by Mark James Chaney, III on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Mark James Chaney, III added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft).(Chaney, Mark) Modified on 11/15/2019 (clw).
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Simonson on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Eric J. Simonson added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft).(Simonson, Eric) Modified on 11/15/2019 (clw).
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (clw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (go)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7902532) filed by Kenneth Kuhn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Samuel J. Ford added to party Kenneth Kuhn(pty:pla).(Ford, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuhn v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kuhn
Represented By: Samuel J. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark James Chaney, III
Represented By: Eric J. Simonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?