Cochran v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Albert W Cochran
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv13174
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020; U.S. Attorney General served on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020; U.S. Attorney General/Department of Justice served on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return, #2 Summons Return)(mm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Notice. Please disregard earlier issued Notice Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7 as it was inadvertently issued. (mp)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Social Security Response Order that Plaintiff's BRIEF is due within 40 days after the defendant has filed his answer, and Defendant's REPLY BRIEF is due within 45 days after the plaintiff's brief is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc: LAED US ATTORNEY)(mp)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR: NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(mp) Modified on 10/28/2019 (mp).
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sent to Plaintiff w/ cc Pauper Orders, Complaints, & Pauper Letter)(mp).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #1 Pauper Letter) (mp).
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Albert W Cochran. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (clw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Albert W Cochran. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(clw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2019: #5 Exhibit) (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochran v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert W Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?