Murla et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Peter Murla and Brenda Murla
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13175
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. Answer due by 12/24/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on November 20, 2019. (mp)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Candace B. Ford added to party Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Ford, Candace)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Peter Murla, Brenda Murla.(Moyer, David)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs re #5 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Moyer, David)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs submit briefing regarding the citizenship status of Defendant Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and the amount in controversy by 10/31/2019 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/24/2019.(jls)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. (pp)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C. filed by Peter Murla, Brenda Murla re #1 Complaint,. (Moyer, David) Modified text on 10/23/2019 (pp).
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7909443) filed by Peter Murla, Brenda Murla. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David S. Moyer added to party Brenda Murla(pty:pla), Attorney David S. Moyer added to party Peter Murla(pty:pla).(Moyer, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murla et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Murla
Represented By: David S. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Murla
Represented By: David S. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jonathan Gray Wilbourn
Represented By: Amanda Strickland Stout
Represented By: Candace B. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?