Walker v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Cleon Walker
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv13223
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Eichberger, Nicole)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Attorney Nicole Ann Eichberger added to party Freedom Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft).(Eichberger, Nicole)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Freedom Mortgage Corporation on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Danenhower, Chad)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (sbs)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7917405) filed by Cleon Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Chad A. Danenhower added to party Cleon Walker(pty:pla).(Danenhower, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleon Walker
Represented By: Chad A. Danenhower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Ann Eichberger
Represented By: Atoyia Scott Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?