Bayou State Fasteners & Industrial Supplies, L.L.C. v. Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bayou State Fasteners & Industrial Supplies, L.L.C.
Defendant: Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13246
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Jury Trial set for 7/27/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 6/9/2020. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(kac)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick Timothy Bergin. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2.5, Patrick Bergin may participate pro hac vice in the above-captioned litigation as co-counsel for defendant. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/13/2019. (jls) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (jls).
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (jls)
November 11, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick Bergin (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-7946968); Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?' before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. (blg)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick Bergin (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-7946968) by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3- Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit 4- Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit 5- Attorney Registration Form, #6 Proposed Order)(Smith, Lea) Modified on 11/11/2019 (blg).
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Bayou State Fasteners & Industrial Supplies, L.L.C. (Nicaud, Albert) Modified on 11/12/2019 (jls).
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 10:15 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference call at the number listed in the notice. By Clerk. (kac)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc..(Smith, Lea) Modified text/link on 10/30/2019 (pp).
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. (Smith, Lea)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Parish Court for the Parish of Jefferson, case number 167-627, Div. B" (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7919278) filed by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Parties and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Lea Ann Smith added to party Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc.(pty:dft).(Smith, Lea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayou State Fasteners & Industrial Supplies, L.L.C. v. Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayou State Fasteners & Industrial Supplies, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Siemssen
Represented By: Albert J. Nicaud
Represented By: Will C Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Represented By: Patrick Timothy Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?