Beatty v. Louisiana Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Ileana Patricia Beatty
Defendant: Louisiana Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv13378
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Louisiana Citizens Property Insurance Corporation on 10/31/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Murray, Bryce)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Louisiana Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. (cg)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Louisiana Citizens Property Insurance Corporation filed by Ileana Patricia Beatty re #1 Complaint,. (Murray, Bryce) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/1/2019) (cg).
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Bryce G. Murray re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Murray, Bryce) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/1/2019) (cg).
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Louisiana Citizens Property Insurance Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7931464) filed by Ileana Patricia Beatty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Charge and Notice)Attorney Bryce G. Murray added to party Ileana Patricia Beatty(pty:pla).(Murray, Bryce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beatty v. Louisiana Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ileana Patricia Beatty
Represented By: Bryce G. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?