Van Wright v. Hornbeck Offshore Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery Van Wright
Defendant: Hornbeck Offshore Services, LLC, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13426
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C..Attorney Robert R. Johnston added to party Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Johnston, Robert)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Anadarko Petroleum Corporation. Answer due 1/8/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy B. Vitter on 12/16/19. (fmm)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Anadarko Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Mark Edward Best added to party Anadarko Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft).(Best, Mark)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Hornbeck Offshore Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(clw)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7938000) filed by Jeffery Van Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney David Christopher Whitmore added to party Jeffery Van Wright(pty:pla).(Whitmore, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Wright v. Hornbeck Offshore Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornbeck Offshore Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Robert Edward Guidry
Represented By: Mark Edward Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Constance C Waguespack
Represented By: Kristin Kay Robbins
Represented By: Robert R. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Van Wright
Represented By: David Christopher Whitmore
Represented By: Lawrence Blake Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?