St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC et al v. Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Center for Restorative Breast Surgery LLC and St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC
Defendant: HMO Louisiana, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company and Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Louisiana, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13497
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
2 Judge: Michael North
3 Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear for Attorney Michael Joseph O'Brien for Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Louisiana, Inc., HMO Louisiana, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/3/2020. (clw)
December 31, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record Michael J. O'Brien by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Louisiana, Inc., HMO Louisiana, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rench, Tyler) Modified text on 12/31/2019 (sbs).
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Defendants regarding #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Just Costs and Actual Expenses, Including Attorneys Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (Drew, Michael)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Just Costs and Actual Expenses, Including Attorneys Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Drew, Michael)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE: Because R. Doc. #11 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Just Costs and Actual Expenses, Including Attorneys Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). **Filing attorney entered incorrect submission date. Correct submission date is 1/08/2020. Clerk took corrective action.** (sbs)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Just Costs and Actual Expenses, Including Attorneys Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) by Center for Restorative Breast Surgery LLC, St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/08/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Notice of Submission)(Sherman, Matthew) Modified text and submission date on 12/6/2019 (sbs).
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Status Conference held on 11/22/2019. The parties discussed the Defendants' Notice of Removal. Plaintiffs indicated they intend to file a motion to remand the matter by December 7, 2019. (bwn)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Notice of Compliance. **Documents submitted on legal sized paper. All documents filed in CM/ECF must be letter sized. Clerk took corrective action by replacing images. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by HMO Louisiana, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Rench, Tyler) Modified text and link on 11/20/2019 (sbs). (Attachments 1-4 replaced on 11/20/2019) (sbs)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a status conference be held in chambers on Friday, November 22, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by HMO Louisiana, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. By the Clerk.(sbs)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Lance M Africk, Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on November 8, 2019. (mp)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Sarah S. Vance recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/8/19. (NEF: Judge Vance)(ko)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case(s) by HMO Louisiana, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company of related case(s) 2:17-cv-04171 and 2:11-cv-00806. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Related Cases)(Rench, Tyler)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with jury demand, from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 17-1095 "C" (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7942597) filed by HMO Louisiana, Inc., Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party HMO Louisiana, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler J. Rench added to party Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Rench, Tyler)(Attachment 1 replaced on 11/12/2019) (sbs). Modified text on 11/12/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC et al v. Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Restorative Breast Surgery LLC
Represented By: Patrick R Follette
Represented By: Matthew Arthur Sherman
Represented By: David Robert Sherman
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC
Represented By: Patrick R Follette
Represented By: Matthew Arthur Sherman
Represented By: David Robert Sherman
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMO Louisiana, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler J. Rench
Represented By: Allison Nunley Pham
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Brien
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Represented By: Richard Allen Sherburne, Jr.
Represented By: Richard John Tyler
Represented By: Jessica W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company
Represented By: Tyler J. Rench
Represented By: Allison Nunley Pham
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Brien
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Represented By: Richard Allen Sherburne, Jr.
Represented By: Richard John Tyler
Represented By: Jessica W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Louisiana, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler J. Rench
Represented By: Allison Nunley Pham
Represented By: Michael Joseph O'Brien
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Represented By: Richard Allen Sherburne, Jr.
Represented By: Richard John Tyler
Represented By: Jessica W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?