O'Connor v. Jet Concrete Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James T O'Connor and James T. O'Connor
Defendant: Jason Rodgers, Edward Keenan and Jet Concrete Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv13644
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court GRANTS the defendants, Jet Concrete Services, LLC, Jason Rodgers, and Ed Keenan, twenty-one (21) additional days to respond to the Complaint for Damages and Demand for Trial by Jury. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/2/2019. (sa)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Jet Concrete Services, LLC, Edward Keenan, Jason Rodgers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Julie Elizabeth O'Shesky added to party Jet Concrete Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Elizabeth O'Shesky added to party Edward Keenan(pty:dft), Attorney Julie Elizabeth O'Shesky added to party Jason Rodgers(pty:dft).(O'Shesky, Julie) Modified text/link on 11/29/2019 (clw).
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jet Concrete Services, LLC, Edward Keenan, Jason Rodgers. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(clw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Tolar, Kenneth)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAEDC-7973682) filed by James T O'Connor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)Attorney Kenneth L. Tolar added to party James T O'Connor (pty:pla).(Tolar, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor v. Jet Concrete Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T O'Connor
Represented By: Kenneth L. Tolar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. O'Connor
Represented By: Kenneth L. Tolar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rodgers
Represented By: John A. Venezia
Represented By: Julie Elizabeth O'Shesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Keenan
Represented By: John A. Venezia
Represented By: Julie Elizabeth O'Shesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jet Concrete Services, LLC
Represented By: John A. Venezia
Represented By: Julie Elizabeth O'Shesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?