United States of America v. Venergy Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Capital Air Balance and United States of America
Defendant: Venergy Group, LLC, "XYZ" Surety Company and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2019cv13835
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by United States of America for the use and benefit of Capital Air Balance, Inc.. (Kaster, Craig) Modified text on 1/14/2020 (am).
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Venergy Group, LLC. (am)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Kaster, Craig)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 **DEFICIENT**NOTICE by Capital Air Balance re #1 Complaint of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Kaster, Craig) Modified text on 11/27/2019 (am).
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7993337) filed by Capital Air Balance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig L. Kaster added to party Capital Air Balance(pty:pla).(Kaster, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Venergy Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Air Balance
Represented By: Craig L. Kaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig L. Kaster
Represented By: Teresa D. Cop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venergy Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "XYZ" Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?