Sierra Club et al v. Angelle et al
Plaintiff: Healthy Gulf, Friends of the Earth, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League, North Carolina Coastal Federation, Sierra Club, Defenders of Wildlife, Natural Resources Defense Council and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement, Department of the Interior, David Bernhardt and Scott Angelle
Intervenor Defendant: American Petroleum Institute
Case Number: 2:2019cv13966
Filed: November 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 58 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-03263. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (mp)
November 26, 2019 Transferring Case Electronically to the District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #43 Motion to Transfer Case; granting #50 Motion to Transfer Case. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY (re #43 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana, or in the Alternative to the District of Columbia ) filed byScott Angelle, David Bernhardt, Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement, Department of the Interior. (Sawyer, Michael) (Filed on 11/22/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 55 REPLY (re #50 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byAmerican Petroleum Institute. (Hainkel, Alida) (Filed on 11/22/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing the Time on Motion Hearing as to #43 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana, or in the Alternative to the District of Columbia, #50 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/20/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER by the Parties Requesting Enlargement of Time to File Replies in Support of Motions to Transfer filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Hainkel)(Hainkel, Alida) (Filed on 11/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 51 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #50 MOTION to Transfer Case , #43 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana, or in the Alternative to the District of Columbia ) filed byCenter For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Earth, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, North Carolina Coastal Federation, Sierra Club, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brettny Hardy, #2 Declaration of David Pettit, #3 Declaration of Hallie Templeton, #4 Declaration of Katheryn Phillips, #5 Declaration of Kimberley Delfino, #6 Declaration of Kristen Monsell)(Hardy, Brettny) (Filed on 11/8/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by American Petroleum Institute. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/8/2019. Replies due by 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Erik Milito in Support of API's Motion to Transfer, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting API's Motion to Transfer)(Dicharry, Sarah) (Filed on 10/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #43 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana, or in the Alternative to the District of Columbia. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #48 Stipulation to enlarge time for the schedule on the defendants' motion to transfer. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER by the Parties Requesting Enlargement of Time for the Schedule on the Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Earth, Healthy Gulf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brettny Hardy)(Hardy, Brettny) (Filed on 10/21/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 47 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pettit, David) (Filed on 10/18/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 46 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Dicharry, Sarah) (Filed on 10/18/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by American Petroleum Institute. (Dicharry, Sarah) (Filed on 10/18/2019) Modified on 10/23/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for October 24, 2019 is continued to December 19, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by December 12, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana, or in the Alternative to the District of Columbia filed by Scott Angelle, David Bernhardt, Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement, Department of the Interior. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 10/25/2019. Replies due by 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frederick A. Brink IV, #2 Declaration of Bruce H. Hesson, P.E., #3 Declaration of Michael S. Sawyer, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X)(Sawyer, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #24 Motion to Intervene. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE by Scott Angelle, David Bernhardt, Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement, Department of the Interior re #24 MOTION to Intervene Regarding Non-Opposition to Motion to Intervene (Sawyer, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 40 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byCenter For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Earth, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, North Carolina Coastal Federation, Sierra Club, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League. (Hardy, Brettny) (Filed on 10/4/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hardy, Brettny) (Filed on 10/3/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 38 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ancel, Devorah) (Filed on 10/3/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 37 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sawyer, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 36 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wannamaker, Catherine) (Filed on 10/3/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wannamaker, Catherine) (Filed on 10/3/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byScott Angelle, David Bernhardt, Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement, Department of the Interior. (Sawyer, Michael) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah Y. Dicharry. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan A. Hunter. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James W. Noe. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alida C. Hainkel. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah Y. Dicharry ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13723696.) filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Oberst, Brett) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan A. Hunter ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13723688.) filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Oberst, Brett) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to James W. Noe ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13723671.) filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Oberst, Brett) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Alida C. Hainkel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13723650.) filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Oberst, Brett) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Petroleum Institute (Oberst, Brett) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene filed by American Petroleum Institute. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 10/4/2019. Replies due by 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erik Milito in Support of American Petroleum Institute's Motion to Intervene, #2 American Petroleum Institute's [Proposed] Answer to First Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Granting American Petroleum Institute's Motion to Intervene)(Oberst, Brett) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #22 To Continue Case Management Conference And Related Deadlines. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/26/2019 has been continued to 10/24/2019 at 11:00 AM to be held telephonic. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/19/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference And Related Deadlines filed by Scott Angelle, David Bernhardt, Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement, Department of the Interior. (Yang, H.) (Filed on 9/19/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Hubert Yang (Yang, H.) (Filed on 9/17/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Administrative Procedure Act Case against All Defendants. Filed by Friends of the Earth, Healthy Gulf, North Carolina Coastal Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League, Center For Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Defenders of Wildlife. (Hardy, Brettny) (Filed on 8/30/2019) Modified on 9/23/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Regarding Pleading Deadlines filed by Scott Angelle, David Bernhardt, Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement, Department of the Interior. (Sawyer, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sawyer (Sawyer, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle-Ann C. Williams (Williams, Michelle-Ann) (Filed on 8/26/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Earth, Healthy Gulf (Eaton, Christopher) (Filed on 7/22/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Catherine Wannamaker. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13477189.) filed by North Carolina Coastal Federation, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League. (Wannamaker, Catherine) (Filed on 6/28/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Eaton. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Parties or counsel may appear personally at 10:00 a.m. or file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am. If any party files such a request to appear by telephone, the Case Management Conference shall be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference.Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 6/27/19. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice , Christopher D. Eaton ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13467855.) filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Earth, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, North Carolina Coastal Federation, Sierra Club, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League. (Hardy, Brettny) (Filed on 6/25/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Earth, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, North Carolina Coastal Federation, Sierra Club, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League.. (Hardy, Brettny) (Filed on 6/24/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Scott Angelle, David Bernhardt, Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement, Department of the Interior. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/25/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Hardy, Brettny) (Filed on 6/11/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Earth, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, North Carolina Coastal Federation, Sierra Club, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League (Hardy, Brettny) (Filed on 6/11/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Earth, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, North Carolina Coastal Federation, Sierra Club, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League (Hardy, Brettny) (Filed on 6/11/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Administrative Procedure Act Case against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13425064.). Filed byFriends of the Earth, Healthy Gulf, North Carolina Coastal Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League, Center For Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Defenders of Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardy, Brettny) (Filed on 6/11/2019) [Transferred from cand on 12/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club et al v. Angelle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthy Gulf
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Christopher D. Eaton
Represented By: Devorah Ancel
Represented By: Joel R. Waltzer
Represented By: Corinne Van Dalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Christopher D. Eaton
Represented By: Corinne Van Dalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Coastal Conservation League
Represented By: Catherine Moore Wannamaker
Represented By: Joel R. Waltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Coastal Federation
Represented By: Catherine Moore Wannamaker
Represented By: Joel R. Waltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Devorah Ancel
Represented By: Joel R. Waltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Christopher D. Eaton
Represented By: Corinne Van Dalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: David Pettit
Represented By: Joel R. Waltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Brettny Elaine Hardy
Represented By: Christopher D. Eaton
Represented By: Corinne Van Dalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C. Williams
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Interior
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C. Williams
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C. Williams
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Angelle
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C. Williams
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Brett Howard Oberst
Represented By: Sarah Y. Dicharry
Represented By: Alida C. Hainkel
Represented By: Jonathan A. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?