United States of America v. KCM Management Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: LCVegas Corporation, KCM Management Inc. and KCM Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv14580
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:2701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Brandon Robers for United States of America. Attorney Corinne Snow terminated. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on January 22, 2020. (mp)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for hearing. Clerk has removed hearing date and modified the text to reflect 'Exparte'. (mp)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Brandon Robers to be substituted in place of Corinne Snow by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snow, Corinne) Modified text on 1/16/2020 (mp).
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to KCM Management Inc., LCVegas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mp)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Notice of Appearance. Document has been stricken. Notice of Appearance is not the proper form to request representation of a party. All attorneys listed on the Complaint who are admitted in the LAED have been added as counsel of record. No further action is necessary. (mp)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdfs of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdfs should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (mp)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 **STRICKEN: NOTICE of Appearance by Corinne Snow on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Snow, Corinne) Modified on 12/13/2019 (mp).
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Corinne Snow added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Snow, Corinne) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/13/2019) (mp). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/13/2019) (mp). (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/13/2019) (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. KCM Management Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCVegas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCM Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCM Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Corinne Snow
Represented By: Jason M. Bigelow
Represented By: Brandon Robers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?