Riley et al v. Dasmen Residential Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Harris, Ashley Brown, Angela L Woodson, Andrea Riley and Dakota Blunt
Defendant: Eastlake Development, LLC, Wilshire Insurance Company, KFK Group, Inc., Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc., Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC, KFK Development, LLC and Lynd Property Management, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv14636
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Counsel: ORDERED that within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel show cause, if any, why the matters listed on this Order should not be consolidated. Such submissions shall be made in writing and filed only in the record of the first case listed in the caption of the Order. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 02/6/2020.(ko)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jonathan M. Walsh, Cassie E. Preston, Victoria J. Cvitanovic for Eastlake Development, LLC, KFK Development, LLC, KFK Group, Inc. Attorney David F. Waguespack; Andrew J Brien and David Scotton terminated. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/22/2020. (clw)
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Eastlake Development, LLC, KFK Development, LLC, KFK Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)Attorney Cassie E. Preston added to party Eastlake Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cassie E. Preston added to party KFK Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cassie E. Preston added to party KFK Group, Inc.(pty:dft).(Preston, Cassie)
January 14, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc..Attorney Troy Lashon Bell added to party Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bell, Troy) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (am).
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC.(Bergeron, Nicholas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Wilshire Insurance Company.(Durbin, Tabitha)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/30/2019.(am)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Notice of Compliance.**Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 5. Clerk properly linked document to document 1.** (am)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Compliance by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC re #1 Notice of removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bergeron, Nicholas) Modified text/linkage on 12/30/2019 (am).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal (Petition) as to Dasmen Residential Management and RH Eastlake, LLC; answer due 1/10/2020. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/20/19. (ecm)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal (Petition) as to Wilshire Insurance Company answer due 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/20/19. (ecm)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bohren, Tucker)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Wilshire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Tabitha Robertson Durbin added to party Wilshire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Durbin, Tabitha)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. By the Clerk.(am)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RH Eastlake, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2019-12035 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8024756) filed by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party Dasmen Residential Management, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party RH Eastlake, LLC(pty:dft).(Bergeron, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley et al v. Dasmen Residential Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Harris
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: DeVonn Henry-Joseph Jarrett
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Brown
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: DeVonn Henry-Joseph Jarrett
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela L Woodson
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: DeVonn Henry-Joseph Jarrett
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Riley
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: DeVonn Henry-Joseph Jarrett
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Blunt
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: DeVonn Henry-Joseph Jarrett
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastlake Development, LLC
Represented By: Cassie E. Preston
Represented By: Jonathan M. Walsh
Represented By: Andrew J Brien
Represented By: David F. Waguespack
Represented By: David Scotton
Represented By: Victoria J. Cvitanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilshire Insurance Company
Represented By: Tabitha Robertson Durbin
Represented By: Mary Kerrigan Dennard
Represented By: Dakota Kyle Chenevert
Represented By: Jennifer E. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KFK Group, Inc.
Represented By: Cassie E. Preston
Represented By: Jonathan M. Walsh
Represented By: Andrew J Brien
Represented By: David F. Waguespack
Represented By: David Scotton
Represented By: Victoria J. Cvitanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Troy Lashon Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dasmen Residential Management, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Bergeron
Represented By: Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.
Represented By: Emily E. Eagan
Represented By: Tucker Tyler Bohren
Represented By: Michael Edward Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RH Eastlake, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Bergeron
Represented By: Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.
Represented By: Emily E. Eagan
Represented By: Tucker Tyler Bohren
Represented By: Michael Edward Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KFK Development, LLC
Represented By: Cassie E. Preston
Represented By: Jonathan M. Walsh
Represented By: Andrew J Brien
Represented By: David F. Waguespack
Represented By: David Scotton
Represented By: Victoria J. Cvitanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynd Property Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?