Hamilton v. Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hamilton
Defendant: Most Rev. Gregory M. Aymond, The Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans, Society of the Divine Word, Southern Province of St. Augustine, Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans, Society of the Divine Word and Gregory M. Aymond
Case Number: 2:2019cv14665
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2020 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gregory M. Aymond, Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans.Attorney Joseph Jacob Lowenthal, Jr added to party Gregory M. Aymond(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Jacob Lowenthal, Jr added to party Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans(pty:dft).(Lowenthal, Joseph)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Society of the Divine Word answer due 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 01/31/2020. (ko)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. This Motion was incorrectly marked as a deficient filing. The deficiency has been removed, and the Motion is now pending before Judge Ashe. No further action necessary. (sa)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Society of the Divine Word. Attorney Terrel J. Broussard added to party Society of the Divine Word(pty:dft).(Broussard, Terrel) Modified text on 1/30/2020 (am). Modified to remove deficiency on 1/31/2020 (sa).
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Society of the Divine Word. (am)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gregory M. Aymond. (am)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans. (am)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Society of the Divine Word filed by Kenneth Hamilton re #1 Complaint,. (Jenkins, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Gregory M. Aymond filed by Kenneth Hamilton re #1 Complaint,. (Jenkins, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans filed by Kenneth Hamilton re #1 Complaint,. (Jenkins, Robert)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
December 18, 2019 Filing fee received from Robert C. Jenkins Jr.: Receipt LAE059446 $ 400 (cc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Kenneth Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Robert Charles Jenkins added to party Kenneth Hamilton(pty:pla).(Jenkins, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hamilton
Represented By: Robert Charles Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Most Rev. Gregory M. Aymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society of the Divine Word, Southern Province of St. Augustine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans
Represented By: Richard Arthur Bordelon
Represented By: Todd Ryan Gennardo
Represented By: Wayne G. Zeringue, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Jacob Lowenthal, Jr.
Represented By: Dylan Karl Knoll
Represented By: Jefferson Randolph Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society of the Divine Word
Represented By: Terrel J. Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory M. Aymond
Represented By: Richard Arthur Bordelon
Represented By: Todd Ryan Gennardo
Represented By: Wayne G. Zeringue, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Jacob Lowenthal, Jr.
Represented By: Dylan Karl Knoll
Represented By: Jefferson Randolph Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?