GeoVera Insurance Company v. Lambert et al
Plaintiff: GeoVera Insurance Company
Defendant: Portia Smith, Individually and on Behalf of Her Minor Child, M.S., Gary Lambert, Jr. and Portia Smith
Case Number: 2:2019cv14783
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff: Ordered that absent an appearance by defendant, Gary Lambert, Jr., that plaintiff moves for entry of default on or before 03/12/2020, or show cause by written motion or memorandum, as is appropriate, why this defendant should not be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/27/2020.(ko)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Gary Lambert, Jr answer due 2/14/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/7/2020. (ko)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint. **The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word Proposed but only reflect Order on the actual document.** (mm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint by Gary Lambert, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Galen M. Hair added to party Gary Lambert, Jr(pty:dft).(Hair, Galen) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (mm).
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Portia Smith on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Schmeeckle, Seth)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Gary Lambert, Jr served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Schmeeckle, Seth)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gary Lambert, Jr. (pp)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Request of Summons Issued as to Gary Lambert, Jr. filed by GeoVera Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (Schmeeckle, Seth)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gary Lambert, Jr., Portia Smith, Individually and on Behalf of Her Minor Child, M.S. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8050280) filed by GeoVera Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Seth Andrew Schmeeckle added to party GeoVera Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Schmeeckle, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GeoVera Insurance Company v. Lambert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GeoVera Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Heather Nicole Sharp
Represented By: Kristopher M. Redmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portia Smith, Individually and on Behalf of Her Minor Child, M.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lambert, Jr.
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Represented By: Kristin M. Lausten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portia Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?