Barlock-Shafer, et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, et al

Plaintiff: Justin Barlock-Shafer, Gaudry, Ranson, Higgins & Gremillion, L.L.C. and Elizabeth Barlock-Shafer
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Social Security Administration, Thomas Boudreaux and United Services Automobile Association
Petitioner: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019mc10349
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENIED as Moot #5 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Oral argument set for Wednesday, 6/5/2019, is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/28/2019. (ajn)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT: IT IS ORDERED that Oral Argument on Defendant, Social Security Administration's #5 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction will be held on Wednesday, 6/5/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/22/2019.(ajn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Dupre, Brock)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by Social Security Administration, United States of America re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Attorney Brock Darren Dupre added to party Social Security Administration(pty:dft).(Dupre, Brock)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE pursuant to 28:1447(b) filed by Clerk.(clc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (djg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC, Jefferson Parish, case number 768-721 K (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Brock Darren Dupre added to party United States of America(pty:ip).(Dupre, Brock) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (clc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barlock-Shafer, et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: P. M. Donovan
Represented By: James L. Donovan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brock Darren Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Boudreaux
Represented By: P. M. Donovan
Represented By: James L. Donovan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: James R. Nieset, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Barlock-Shafer
Represented By: J. Neale deGravelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaudry, Ranson, Higgins & Gremillion, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ryan C. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Barlock-Shafer
Represented By: J. Neale deGravelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Brock Darren Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?