Lafaye et al v. New Orleans City
Plaintiff: Lisa Picone, Inez Victoriana and Susan Lafaye
Defendant: City of New Orleans and New Orleans City
Petitioner: Ms. Susan Lafaye and Ms. Inez Victoriana
Case Number: 2:2020cv00041
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Susie Morgan
3 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to New Orleans City; answer due 3/21/2020. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(St. Raymond, Corwin)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The City of New Orleans is allowed an additional twenty-one (21) days, or until February 20, 2020 to file responsive pleadings in the captioned matter. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Corwin St. Raymond added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(St. Raymond, Corwin)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Lance M Africk, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on January 9, 2020.(mp)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (McMahon, Joseph)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to New Orleans City. (mp)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to City of New Orleans filed by Susan Lafaye, Inez Victoriana, Lisa Picone re #1 Complaint,. (McMahon, Joseph)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8061574) filed by Susan Lafaye, Inez Victoriana, Lisa Picone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Joseph R. McMahon, III added to party Susan Lafaye(pty:pet), Attorney Joseph R. McMahon, III added to party Lisa Picone(pty:pet), Attorney Joseph R. McMahon, III added to party Inez Victoriana(pty:pet).(McMahon, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lafaye et al v. New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Picone
Represented By: Joseph R. McMahon, III
Represented By: Anthony Scott Maska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inez Victoriana
Represented By: Joseph R. McMahon, III
Represented By: Anthony Scott Maska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lafaye
Represented By: Joseph R. McMahon, III
Represented By: Anthony Scott Maska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ms. Susan Lafaye
Represented By: Joseph R. McMahon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ms. Inez Victoriana
Represented By: Joseph R. McMahon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Donesia Diane Turner
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Sunni Jones LeBeouf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?