United States of America v. Currency, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Currency
Claimant: Amininim Batubo
Case Number: 2:2020cv00044
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2020 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/5/2020.(jjs)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Amininim Batubo.(Becker, Walter) Modified text on 3/2/2020 (mm).
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Claim by Amininim Batubo. (Becker, Walter)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 WARRANT of Arrest Issued. (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest)(mm) (3 CC USM)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Currency (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Request for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #3 Appendix US Marshals Form 285)Attorney Michael B. Redmann added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Redmann, Michael) Modified text on 1/7/2020 (mm). (3CC USM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Currency, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael B. Redmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Amininim Batubo
Represented By: Walter Francis Becker, Jr.
Represented By: Rosalie Margaret Haug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?