Bonilla et al v. James River Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jasmin Bonilla and Jaselin Bonilla
Defendant: Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange, Riad hassani, Rasier, LLC and James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00058
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter)(sbs)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Telephone Conference held on 1/23/2020. During the telephone status conference, counsel for Rasier represented that he agrees complete diversity of citizenship does not exist in this case. As a result, Rasier does not oppose remanding this case to state court. The Court will issue a separate order remanding this case to state court. (bwn)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - A telephone status conference will be held on Thursday, January 23, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. The Court will provide the parties with the call-in instructions necessary to participate in the conference via telephone. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/22/2020.(sbs)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Rachel Ann Meese for Jaselin Bonilla, Jasmin Bonilla. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/21/2020. (clw)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Rachel Meese by Jaselin Bonilla, Jasmin Bonilla. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Rachel Ann Meese added to party Jaselin Bonilla(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel Ann Meese added to party Jasmin Bonilla(pty:pla).(Meese, Rachel) Modified text on 1/21/2020 (sbs).
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-09600 J (15) (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8094373) filed by Rasier, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Davidson, Jared) Modified text on 1/17/2020 (sbs).
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal - IT IS ORDERED that Rasier determine in good faith whether diversity jurisdiction exists in this case and, if so, file an amended notice of removal establishing jurisdiction by no later than Friday, January 17, 2020. If no amended notice of removal is filed by that date, this action will be remanded. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Rasier, LLC. By the Clerk(sbs)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-09600 J (15) (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8066945) filed by Rasier, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of DAJ, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Derrick A. Jusczak added to party Rasier, LLC(pty:dft).(Jusczak, Derrick) (Attachment 9 replaced on 1/9/2020) (sbs). Modified text on 1/9/2020 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonilla et al v. James River Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmin Bonilla
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Represented By: Eric Anthony Wright
Represented By: Daryl A. Gray
Represented By: Raynique Trenice Keelen
Represented By: Charity Nicole Clynique Bruce
Represented By: Brandon Anthony Brisco
Represented By: Jeremy J. Pichon
Represented By: Pamela V Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaselin Bonilla
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Represented By: Eric Anthony Wright
Represented By: Daryl A. Gray
Represented By: Raynique Trenice Keelen
Represented By: Charity Nicole Clynique Bruce
Represented By: Brandon Anthony Brisco
Represented By: Jeremy J. Pichon
Represented By: Pamela V Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Frank Allen Romeu, Jr.
Represented By: Jairo F. Sanchez
Represented By: George P. Hebbler, Jr.
Represented By: Donna Bramlett Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riad hassani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Represented By: Derrick A. Jusczak
Represented By: Jared A. Davidson
Represented By: Paula Marcello Wellons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Lyon H. Garrison
Represented By: Kevin Truxillo
Represented By: Ebony Shadae Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?