Collins v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Collins
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, David's Bridal, Inc., David's Bridal Inc and Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00073
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 7/6/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(ko)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Discovery Requests, MOTION for Discovery by David's Bridal Inc, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jani, Alexis) Modified text on 2/21/2020 (mm).
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by David's Bridal Inc, Twin City Fire Insurance Company.(Jani, Alexis)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Clerk entered signature date in field for the answer due date when docketing Order granting Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due date for defendants Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and David's Bridal, Inc. is 02/14/2020. Clerk took corrective action. (ko)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to David's Bridal Inc, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company answer due 02/14/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 01/27/2020. (ko) Modified on 2/5/2020 (ko).
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by David's Bridal Inc, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jani, Alexis)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Twenty-Fourth JDC Parish of Jefferson, case number 801-602 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8068188) filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 List of Party Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit 2 - Motion for Extension of Time, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing of Removal, #5 Exhibit 4 - Sec of State from IN, #6 Exhibit 5 - Sec of State from PA, #7 Exhibit 6 - Correspondence re service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Alexis R. Jani added to party Hartford Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Jani, Alexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexis R. Jani
Represented By: Kriste Talton Utley
Represented By: Ross Adam Ledet
Represented By: Terrill W. Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David's Bridal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David's Bridal Inc
Represented By: Alexis R. Jani
Represented By: Kriste Talton Utley
Represented By: Ross Adam Ledet
Represented By: Terrill W. Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexis R. Jani
Represented By: Kriste Talton Utley
Represented By: Ross Adam Ledet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Collins
Represented By: Matthew Donald Hemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?