Hill v. Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Hill
Defendant: James River Insurance Company, Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Victor Amanuel Aguilar Flores
Case Number: 2:2020cv00097
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Status Conference set for 4/17/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. All discovery must be completed by 9/21/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on March 6, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(mp)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by James River Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Return on Service of Process)(Poole, John)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 2:30 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. By the Clerk.(jeg)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney attached a Statement of Corporate Disclosures to this Notice of Removal instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the Statement of Corporate Disclosures and docketing it as a separate entry. Please follow this requirement on future pleadings.** (jeg)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by James River Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent James River Group Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent James River Group, Inc. for James River Insurance Company (jeg)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 19-8144 Div A Sec 16 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8075746) filed by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Petition for Damages, #2 State Court Pleadings Dismissal of Non-Diverse Party, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff Demand, #4 Affidavit Of Counsel of Record regarding Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure)Attorney John Reed Poole, Jr added to party James River Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Poole, John) (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/14/2020) (jeg). Modified text on 1/14/2020 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: John Reed Poole, Jr.
Represented By: Lyon H. Garrison
Represented By: Kevin Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Amanuel Aguilar Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Hill
Represented By: Douglas James Womac
Represented By: Edward J. Womac, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?