Hancock Whitney Bank v. Boyd, et al
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Defendant: Wendell R. Boyd, Jr. and Wendell R. Boyd, III
Case Number: 2:2020cv00099
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Wendell R. Boyd, Jr. and Wendell R. Boyd, III by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Moses, Leann)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 DEFICIENT: MOTION for Entry of Default as to Wendell R. Boyd, Jr. and Wendell R. Boyd, III by Hancock Whitney Bank. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Moses, Leann) Modified text on 3/9/2020 (mm).
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Certificate of Service. **Filed in error. Should have been filed with record document 7. However, record document 7 is deficient. File as an attachment when refiling doc. 7.** (mm)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 **FILED IN ERROR-SHOULD BE ATTACHED TO REC. DOC. 7** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hancock Whitney Bank re #7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Wendell R. Boyd, Jr. and Wendell R. Boyd, III. (Moses, Leann) Modified text on 3/5/2020 (mm).
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 DEFICIENT: MOTION for Entry of Default as to Wendell R. Boyd, Jr. and Wendell R. Boyd, III by Hancock Whitney Bank. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/5/2020. (Moses, Leann) Modified text on 3/5/2020 (mm).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff: ORDERED that plaintiff moves for entry of default on or before 03/12/2020, or show cause by written motion or memorandum, as is appropriate, why defendants, Wendell R. Boyd, Jr. and Wendell R. Boyd, III, should not be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without further. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/21/2020.(ko)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Wendell R. Boyd, III served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Moses, Leann)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Wendell R. Boyd, Jr served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (Moses, Leann)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wendell R. Boyd, III, Wendell R. Boyd, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8076990) filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) Attorney Leann Opotowsky Moses added to party Hancock Whitney Bank(pty:pla).(Moses, Leann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock Whitney Bank v. Boyd, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell R. Boyd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell R. Boyd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Represented By: Leann Opotowsky Moses
Represented By: William Thomas Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?