Mballa-Ndzana v. Capital One, N.A.
Plaintiff: Edwige Mballa-Ndzana
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00248
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Capital One, N.A., answer due 3/16/2020. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/19/2020. (clw)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Larry Feldman, Jr added to party Capital One, N.A.(pty:dft).(Feldman, Larry)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One, N.A. (jeg)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Capital One, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8105225) filed by Edwige Mballa-Ndzana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Samuel J. Ford added to party Edwige Mballa-Ndzana(pty:pla).(Ford, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mballa-Ndzana v. Capital One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwige Mballa-Ndzana
Represented By: Samuel J. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?