Young v. LeBlanc et al
Plaintiff: Michael Young
Defendant: Robert Tanner, James LeBlanc, Beverly Kelly, Billy Anderson and Keith Bickham
Case Number: 2:2020cv00278
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Plaintiff's "Motion of Voluntary Dismissal". The Clerk is directed to mark this matter closed pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/17/2020. (dw)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Heather Hood by Billy Anderson, Keith Bickham, Beverly Kelly, James LeBlanc, Robert Tanner. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Heather Charlotte Hood added to party Billy Anderson(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Charlotte Hood added to party Keith Bickham(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Charlotte Hood added to party Beverly Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Charlotte Hood added to party James LeBlanc(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Charlotte Hood added to party Robert Tanner(pty:dft).(Hood, Heather) Modified text on 3/17/2020 (cwa).
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Young. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (sa)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; James LeBlanc served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (cwa)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Billy Anderson, Keith Bickham, Beverly Kelly, James LeBlanc, Robert Tanner. (Attachments: #1 Summons Robert Tanner, #2 Summons Keith Bickham, #3 Summons Beverly Kelly, #4 Summons Billy Anderson)(dw) (cc: USM w/ Pauper Order and Complaint)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $8.80 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to MICHAEL YOUNG, #456140 in monthly payments as set out in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 2/10/2020.(dw) (NEF: Financial, cc: Warden)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Young. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Original IFP)(clw)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 2/19/2020. (clw)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Young. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (clw)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Billy Anderson, Keith Bickham, Beverly Kelly, James LeBlanc, Robert Tanner filed by Michael Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tanner
Represented By: Heather Charlotte Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Represented By: Heather Charlotte Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Kelly
Represented By: Heather Charlotte Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Anderson
Represented By: Heather Charlotte Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bickham
Represented By: Heather Charlotte Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?