Badon v. Berry's Reliable Resources, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Badon
Defendant: Rhonda Williams and Berry's Reliable Resources, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00584
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
3 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filed Pursuant to FRCP 15 against All Defendants filed by Anthony Badon.(Jackson, Mary)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The Court has been informed that the above-captioned case is related to Civil Action No. 19-12317, Stacey Badon v. Berry's Reliable Resources, LLC, et al. previously allotted to Section "D"(3) of this Court. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned matter be TRANSFERRED to Section "D"(3) for further proceedings. Judge Carl Barbier, Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/2/2020.(cg)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Berry's Reliable Resources, LLC, Rhonda Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(cg)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8154512) filed by Anthony Badon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Summons Berry's Reliable Resources, LLC, #5 Summons Rhonda Williams)Attorney Mary Bubbett Jackson added to party Anthony Badon(pty:pla).(Jackson, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Badon v. Berry's Reliable Resources, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berry's Reliable Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Badon
Represented By: Mary Bubbett Jackson
Represented By: Jody Forester Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?