Turnkey Offshore Project Services, LLC v. Morrison Engergy Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Turnkey Offshore Project Services, LLC
Defendant: Morrison Energy Group, LLC, Chet Morrison Contractors, LLC, Chet Morrison Contractors and Morrison Engergy Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00858
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Chet Morrison Contractors on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Morrison Engergy Group LLC on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service for Chet Morrison Contractors, LLC)(Nalley, George) Modified text on 3/20/2020 (pp).
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chet Morrison Contractors, Morrison Engergy Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(pp)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8210927) filed by Turnkey Offshore Project Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Morrison Energy Group, #10 Summons Chet Morrison Contractors)Attorney George John Nalley, Jr added to party Turnkey Offshore Project Services, LLC(pty:pla).(Nalley, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turnkey Offshore Project Services, LLC v. Morrison Engergy Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison Energy Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chet Morrison Contractors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chet Morrison Contractors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison Engergy Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turnkey Offshore Project Services, LLC
Represented By: George John Nalley, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew James Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?