Ruello et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Plaintiff: Dennis Louis Ruello and Lori Ruello
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00895
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Compel. To the extent Plaintiffs have not already done so, within seven days they shall provide 5 available dates for their depositions in May or June. The depositions may be conducted via video or telephone in order to maintain appropriate COVID-19 precautions. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/1/2020. (ajn)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2020 2:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Rule 37.1 Certificate, #4 Notice of Submission)(Fadaol, Devin)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's attorney, Dennis Couvillion petition the court for re-admission (1), substitution or withdrawal on or before 5/15/2020 or Show Cause on that date by written memorandum why he should not be removed from this case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/15/2020.(ajn)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 ***DEFICIENT*** MOTION to Compel DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Fadaol, Devin) Modified on 4/17/2020 (ajn).
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Fadaol, Devin) Modified text on 3/31/2020 (ajn).
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. ***Filing attorney attached the incorrect document. A Civil Cover Sheet is attached instead of the Corporate Disclosure Statement.*** (ajn)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fadaol, Devin)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 ***ERROR-INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED***Statement of Corporate Disclosure by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Fadaol, Devin) Modified on 3/31/2020 (ajn).
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE Pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal.(ajn)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th JDC, case number 795-488, Div. "G" (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8216004) filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXIBIT B - Discovery Propounded, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C - Discovery Responses)Attorney Devin Fadaol added to party JP Morgan Chase Bank NA(pty:dft).(Fadaol, Devin) Modified on 3/16/2020 (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruello et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Louis Ruello
Represented By: Dennis P. Couvillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ruello
Represented By: Dennis P. Couvillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Devin Fadaol
Represented By: Mary W. Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?